Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013164357 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12166316 | 01.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2659908 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12166316 | 01.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR092316 | 15.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12166316 | 01.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201345927 | 16.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12166316 | 01.05.2012 |