EP2520222 - Biological information processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroda, Masao c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12166550.9 | 03.05.2012 | [2012/45] | Priority number, date | JP20110103448 | 06.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011103448 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2520222 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0205, A61B5/024, A61B5/11 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
A61B5/02416 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung biologischer Informationen | [2012/45] | English: | Biological information processing device | [2012/45] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'informations biologiques | [2012/45] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010179389 (MORONEY III RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * figures 10,11 * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0045] * [Y] 8 [I] 2-5,7; | [YA]WO2007053146 (UNIV GEORGIA STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [Y] 8 * page 20, line 24 - page 21, line 14 * [A] 1; | [A]US4312358 (BARNEY GEORGE M) [A] 1 * column 8, line 17 - line 45 *; | [A]US6241684 (AMANO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 14, line 5 - column 15, line 18 * * column 11, line 14 - line 61 *; | [A]EP1908402 (ETA SA MFT HORLOGERE SUISSE [CH]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0031] *; | [A]EP2070473 (POLAR ELECTRO OY [FI]) [A] 2-5 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2007249949 (HADLEY DAVID M [US]) [A] 2-5 * figures 4,5 * | by applicant | JP2004283228 | JP2009034366 | JP2004081745 |