EP2660568 - Error compensation by means of measuring STC filter function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstrasse 1 - 5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultheiss, Daniel Reichenbacherstrasse 37 78132 Hornberg / DE | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12166603.6 | 03.05.2012 | [2013/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2660568 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/284, G01S7/40 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP,US);
G01F25/24 (EP,US);
G01S13/02 (US);
G01S13/88 (EP,US);
G01S7/02 (US);
G01S7/354 (EP,US);
G01S7/4021 (EP,US);
G01S7/493 (EP,US);
G01S7/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fehlerkompensation durch Vermessen der STC-Filterfunktion | [2013/45] | English: | Error compensation by means of measuring STC filter function | [2013/45] | French: | Compensation d'erreurs par la mesure de la fonction de filtre STC | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 30.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102008050117 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008012029 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0079] *; | [A]EP1207406 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US7982664 (USCINOWICZ MICHAEL B [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 15, line 41 - column 16, line 33 *; | [A]WO9709637 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, line 26 - page 4, line 35 *; | [A]US4737791 (JEAN BUFORD R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |