EP2484974 - Burner with diffuser resistant to high operating temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WORGAS BRUCIATORI S.R.L. Via A. Coppi, 17 I-41043 Formigine / IT | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giloli, Massimo Via Val D'Aosta, 36 41043 Formigine (MO) / IT | 02 /
Dotti, Massimo Via Donatello, 8 42010 Salvaterra (RE) / IT | 03 /
Berthold, Gunther Via Medusia 1-P 41014 Levizzano Rangone (MO) / IT | 04 /
Wijkmans, Stephanus Via Marconi, 13 41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT | 05 /
Fogliani, Giuseppe Via Salvo d'Acquisto, 11 41043 Formigine (MO) / IT | 06 /
Vecchi, Renzo Via Giolitti, 26 41043 Formigine (MO) / IT | 07 /
Mach, Wenzel Orangerie Strasse, 39 Dessau-Mosigkau / DE | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41124 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 12166859.4 | 18.06.2004 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | IT2003MO00180 | 19.06.2003 Original published format: IT MO20030180 | IT2004MO00031 | 11.02.2004 Original published format: IT MO20040031 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2484974 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2484974 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/02, F23D14/58, F23D14/04 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
F23D14/02 (EP);
F23D14/045 (EP);
F23D14/58 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | F23D14/02, F23D14/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | Brenner mit einem gegen hohe Betriebstemperaturen resistenten Diffusor | [2012/32] | English: | Burner with diffuser resistant to high operating temperatures | [2012/32] | French: | Brûleur avec diffuseur résistant à des températures de fonctionnement élevées | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/37] | 04.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04740081.7 / EP1634018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0774623 (DEJATECH BV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 6 - column 10, line 20; figures 1-5D *; | [A]EP0679838 (CHAFFOTEAUX ET MAURY [FR]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 44; figures 1-5 *; | [A]JPS5835314 ; | [A]EP0565145 (SCANFERLA GIORGIO [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE8914388U (JOH. VAILLANT GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830520), vol. 0071, no. 16, Database accession no. (M - 216), & JP58035314 A 19830302 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0474008 | EP0774623 | EP0679838 | JPS5835314B |