EP2662737 - Simulation device, method for operating a simulation device and use of a simulation device and method for operating a simulation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prognost Systems GmbH Birkenallee 177 48432 Rheine / DE | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koers, Christian Dorfbauerschaft 20 48493 Wettringen / DE | 02 /
Hörnschemeyer, Klaus Antoniusstrasse 6 49811 Lingen / DE | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Werner & ten Brink Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Am Berghang 61 48455 Bad Bentheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Werner & ten Brink Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Am Berghang 61 48455 Bad Bentheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12167205.9 | 08.05.2012 | [2013/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2662737 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G05B17/02 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
G05B17/02 (EP);
G05B2219/24061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Simulationseinrichtung, Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Simulationseinrichtung sowie Verwendung einer Simulationseinrichtung und eines Verfahrens zum Betrieb einer Simulationseinrichtung | [2013/46] | English: | Simulation device, method for operating a simulation device and use of a simulation device and method for operating a simulation device | [2013/46] | French: | Installation de simulation, procédé de fonctionnement d'une installation de simulation ainsi qu'utilisation d'une installation de simulation et d'un procédé de fonctionnement d'une installation de simulation | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102008050612 (CONDUCTA ENDRESS & HAUSER [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]DE102005041427 (CONDUCTA ENDRESS & HAUSER [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] *; | [Y]US2011106517 (SAIAS DANIEL [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * |