Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
01.07.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.06.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.11.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |