EP2500443 - NI-TI semi-finished products and related methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAES Smart Materials 4355 Middle Settlement Road New Hartford, NY 13413 / US | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sczerzenie, Francis E. 49a, Lake Pleasant New York, NY 12108 / US | 02 /
Paul Graeme, William 1717 W Cimarron Ln Spokane, WA 99208-5090 / US | [2013/01] |
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
Sczerzenie, Francis E. 49a, Lake Pleasant New York, NY 12108 / US | ||
02 /
Paul Graeme, William 7202 Stearns Road Rome, NY 13440 / US | |||
Former [2012/38] | 01 /
Sczerzenie, Francis E. 49a, Lake Pleasant New York, NY 12108 / US | ||
02 /
Paul Graeme, William Stearns Road Rome, NY 13440 / US | Representative(s) | Concone, Emanuele Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [2015/31] |
Former [2012/38] | Concone, Emanuele Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12167433.7 | 28.10.2010 | [2012/38] | Priority number, date | US20090257195P | 02.11.2009 Original published format: US 257195 P | US20100308236P | 25.02.2010 Original published format: US 308236 P | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2500443 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2500443 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/00 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
C22C19/007 (EP,US);
C22C19/03 (EP,KR,US);
C22C19/05 (EP,US);
C22F1/006 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12021 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2012/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NI-TI-halbgefertigte Produkte und entsprechende Verfahren | [2012/38] | English: | NI-TI semi-finished products and related methods | [2012/38] | French: | Produits semi-finis NI-TI et procédés associés | [2012/38] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10827498.6 / EP2496724 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100827498) is 13.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2010 | AL | 29.07.2015 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | LU | 28.10.2015 | GB | 29.10.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 28.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
GB | 29.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008053577 (SYED TOFAIL ANSAR [IE], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0019] *; | [X]US4894100 (YAMAUCHI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 24 *; | [X]US2002112788 (TANAKA TOYONOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0005] *; | [X]JPS5928548 (OTSUKA KAZUHIRO, et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2006037672 | US4337900 | WO02063375 | EP0465836 | US3660082 | WO2008030517 | JPS5928548B | JPS63235444 | JPH0626648B | - C. M. WAYMAN, "Shape Memory Alloys", MRS BULLETIN, (199304), pages 49 - 56 | - M. NISHIDA ET AL., "Precipitation Processes in Near-Equiatimic TiNi Shape Memory Alloys", METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS A, (198609), vol. 17A, pages 1505 - 1515 | - H. HOSODA ET AL., "Martensitic transformation temperatures and mechanical properties of ternary NiTi alloys with offstoichiometric compositions", INTERMETALLICS, (1998), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S0966-9795(97)00100-3, pages 291 - 301, XP004121140 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0966-9795(97)00100-3 | - M. NISHIDA; C. M. WAYMAN; T. HONMA, "Precipitation Processes in Near-Equiatomic NiTi Shape Memory Alloys", METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS, A, (198609), vol. 17, pages 1505 - 1515 |