Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2487153
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.07.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
08.04.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.03.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2014 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
27.05.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.05.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.10.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.10.2013 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.08.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
13.07.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
16.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|