EP2550900 - Product dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dirk A. Brügmann Kunststoff-Verarbeitung GmbH & Co. KG Werkzeugstrasse 18 58092 Hagen / DE | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brügmann, Lars Werkzeugstrasse 18 58093 Hagen / DE | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Schweiger, Johannes, et al Becker & Müller Patentanwälte Turmstr. 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Schweiger, Johannes, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12167663.9 | 11.05.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | DE20111052167 | 27.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011052167 | [2013/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550900 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550900 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47F1/12, G07F11/30 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
A47F1/126 (EP,US);
G07F11/30 (EP,US);
G07F11/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Title | German: | Produktausgabeeinrichtung | [2013/05] | English: | Product dispenser | [2013/05] | French: | Distributeur de produit | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2012 | AL | 29.01.2014 | BG | 29.01.2014 | CY | 29.01.2014 | CZ | 29.01.2014 | DK | 29.01.2014 | EE | 29.01.2014 | ES | 29.01.2014 | FI | 29.01.2014 | HR | 29.01.2014 | IT | 29.01.2014 | LT | 29.01.2014 | LV | 29.01.2014 | MC | 29.01.2014 | MK | 29.01.2014 | MT | 29.01.2014 | PL | 29.01.2014 | RO | 29.01.2014 | RS | 29.01.2014 | SE | 29.01.2014 | SI | 29.01.2014 | SK | 29.01.2014 | SM | 29.01.2014 | TR | 29.01.2014 | NO | 29.04.2014 | GR | 30.04.2014 | IS | 29.05.2014 | PT | 29.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.05.2012 | |
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MK | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.05.2012 | |
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.05.2012 | |
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 29.01.2014 | |
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010017025 (LOCKWOOD THOMAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,11,12 * figures 1-5, 22, 23 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 9,10; | [XI]US2522896 (MILTON RIFKIN, et al) [X] 1-5,8,11,12 * figures 1-13 * [I] 6,7,9,10; | [Y]US2010059469 (MASON JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * figures 1-37 * |