EP2522452 - Combined heating by means of induction heating the workpiece and applying a coating by means of laser soldering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Change - applicant | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanrieder, Herbert Herschenhofen 17 85411 Hohenkammer / DE | [2012/46] | Application number, filing date | 12167694.4 | 11.05.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | DE201110101576 | 13.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011101576 | [2012/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522452 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/005, B23K1/20, B23K26/42, C21D1/42, F01D5/00, C23C28/00 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
B23K1/0056 (EP,US);
B23K1/20 (EP,US);
B23K26/60 (EP,US);
B23K35/3033 (EP,US);
B23K35/3046 (EP,US);
B23K35/325 (EP,US);
B23K35/327 (EP,US);
C23C28/3215 (EP,US);
C23C28/324 (EP,US);
C23C28/325 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C28/341 (EP,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kombinierte Erwärmung zum Auflöten einer Spitzenpanzerung mittels Induktion und Laser | [2012/46] | English: | Combined heating by means of induction heating the workpiece and applying a coating by means of laser soldering | [2012/46] | French: | Chauffage combiné destinée au chauffage de la pièce par induction et au brasage laser pour appliquer un revêtement | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 01.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/25] | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003121574 (BRENNER BERNDT [DE], et al) [X] 11,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] , [0034] , [0039] , [0061]; figures 1a,4; claims 19,26 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US2007160873 (FRELING MELVIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] *; | [XA] - Eric Stiles, "Laser Based Hybrid Techniques for Surface Coating", (20071011), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071011155945/http://www.ccl.fraunhofer.org/working_areas/technologies/technology_03/cladding/e_hybrid.php, (20120831), XP055036950 [X] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1 | by applicant | DE102009008887 | DE102007010256 | DE102009007666 | DE102008003100 | US4818833 | CH674650 |