EP2527857 - Three-axis magnetic sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rieger, Ryan W. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Withanawasam, Lakshman HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2012/48] | Application number, filing date | 12167766.0 | 11.05.2012 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | US201113116844 | 26.05.2011 Original published format: US201113116844 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2527857 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/02 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
G01R33/0206 (EP,US);
G01R33/0005 (EP);
G01R33/063 (EP);
G01R33/07 (EP);
G01R33/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dreiachsige Magnetsensoren | [2012/48] | English: | Three-axis magnetic sensors | [2012/48] | French: | Capteurs magnétiques à trois axes | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 19.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |