EP2533133 - Information processing apparatus, information processing method, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noda, Takuro c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard Partnerschaft Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/18] | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/50] | Mills, Julia D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12167985.6 | 15.05.2012 | [2012/50] | Priority number, date | JP20110127389 | 07.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011127389 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2533133 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (EP,US);
G06F3/04815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren und Programm | [2012/50] | English: | Information processing apparatus, information processing method, and program | [2012/50] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'informations, procédé de traitement d'informations et programme | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 11.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 02.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/35] | 11.04.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0002187 (DELUCA MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 6, line 9 *; | [Y]US2007125633 (BOILLOT MARC [US]) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0063] , [0069] * | by applicant | JP2010157189 | JP2011127389 |