EP2549803 - BASE STATION, COMMUNICATION METHOD AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Satoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Bun c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Tomita, Tetsuo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Hashimoto, Masanori c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2013/04] | Holz, Ulrike Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 12168335.3 | 16.05.2012 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | JP20110158274 | 19.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011158274 | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2549803 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2549803 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04W36/00835 (EP,US);
H04B7/2606 (EP,US);
H04W36/0064 (EP,US);
H04W84/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2013/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BASISSTATION, DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2018/18] | English: | BASE STATION, COMMUNICATION METHOD AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2013/04] | French: | STATION DE BASE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/18] |
Former [2013/04] | Basisstation, drahtloses Kommunikationsverfahren und drahtloses Kommunikationssystem | ||
Former [2013/04] | Station de base, procédé de communication et système de communication sans fil | Examination procedure | 09.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 05.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 26.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2008171553 (REN FANG-CHING [TW], et al); | [YA]US2010046396 (CAI SEAN [US], et al); | [YA]WO2011061990 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | US2012225657 [ ] (WATANABE YOSHINORI [JP], et al) |