Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
20.01.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.05.2013 | Publication of search report | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
10.05.2013 | Change - classification | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
10.05.2013 | Change - classification | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
20.11.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |