EP2524812 - Remote marking and photochromic solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bloomfield Science Museum Jerusalem Hebrew University Givat Ram Jerusalem 91904 / IL | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ben Shalom, Amir 8 Mantur Street 71706 Modiin / IL | 02 /
Rosenberg, Jacob 19 Givat Canada Street 93890 Jerusalem / IL | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP 1st Floor, Box Tree House Northminster Business Park Northfield Lane York, YO26 6QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12168453.4 | 18.05.2012 | [2012/47] | Priority number, date | US201161487307P | 18.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161487307 P | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2524812 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2524812 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/28, B41M5/34, C09D11/00 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
B41M5/284 (EP,US);
G21K5/00 (US);
B41M5/34 (EP,US);
C09D11/50 (EP,US);
G01F1/704 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fernmarkierung und photochromische Lösung | [2012/47] | English: | Remote marking and photochromic solution | [2012/47] | French: | Marquage à distance et solution photochromique | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6022648 (JACOBSON JOSEPH M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 54 * * figures 1-8; claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO0104702 (INKSURE LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 4, line 8 - page 6, line 11 * * page 9, line 16 - page 13, line 5 * * figures 1, 2; claims 1-16 *; | [X]JP2003043241 (KYODO PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * claims 1, 2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]US2006241225 (BIELEK YAN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0043] ** claims 1-31 *; | [X]US2006290595 (TAKEUCHI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0094] * * figure 1; claims 1-12 * |