01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
24.01.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
13.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
15.02.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
11.02.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.02.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.02.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.01.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
01.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
01.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2017 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] |
15.12.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] |
15.12.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] |
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
19.06.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
30.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
11.12.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |