Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP2532681

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
 LV 
 MC 
 NL 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 TR 
Examination procedure21.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted01.10.2014
Opposition procedure02.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit published on 09.09.2015 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:AL BA HR MK RS
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20120615
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1964852
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20130701
 
Event date:04.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1179638 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/566 20060101ALN20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 31/18 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12P 21/08 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 16/28 20060101AFI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 43/00 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N 5/10 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 48/00 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/53 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 37/02 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 17/06 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/68 20060101ALN20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/577 20060101ALN20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/395 20060101ALI20140117BHEP
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/00 20060101ALN20140117BHEP
 
Event date:14.05.2014 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20140414
 
Event date:04.06.2014 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:SBI BIOTECH CO., LTD.
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1964852
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:AL BA HR MK RS
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 689524 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20141015
 
Event date:15.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:22.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:13.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602006043239 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20141113
 
Event date:05.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2526079 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20150105
 
Event date:05.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20141218
 
Event date:23.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20141211
 
Event date:20.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:16.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E010055 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20141215
 
Event date:03.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 17729 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:31.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:28.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E022531 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:21.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1179638 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:09.09.2015 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20150702
 
Event date:02.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602006043239 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:17.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:11.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20140402556 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20150128
 
Event date:09.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:11.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20151220
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20151220
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Effective DATE:20170710
 
Event date:13.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:15.11.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20141226 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20191029
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:16.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20141226 HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:27.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20141226 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA
 
Event date:14.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20141226 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20181129
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:08.01.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20141226 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20201218
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:26.08.2014 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:14.04.2014 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:11.12.2012 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:07.08.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:07.01.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20141226 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20211217
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:07.08.2015 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:06.01.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20141226 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20221216
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:12.07.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230530
 
Event date:22.12.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20141226 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20231121
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20231128
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:12.12.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20241125
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:16.12.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:16.12.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:09.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:10.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:03.01.2025 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20141226 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20241205
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:14.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20241126
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:15.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20241122
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20241122
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:17.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20241122
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:20.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:20.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20241126
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:21.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20241122
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:21.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:23.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20241122
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:23.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20241128
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:23.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20241209
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:24.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20241127
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:24.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20241122
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:27.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20241127
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:27.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20241217
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:28.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:29.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:03.02.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20241126
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:25.02.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20241129
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:17.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20250102
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20250101
Year of Fee Payment:19