EP2522749 - MicroRNA expression profile associated with pancreatic cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201-1063 / US | For all designated states Brackett, Daniel J. 2812 William Blvd. Seminole, OK 74868 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states The Ohio State University 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmittgen, Thomas, D 93 Alberry Drive Granville, OH 43023 / US | 02 /
Brackett, Daniel, J 2812 William Blvd. Seminole, OK 74868 / US | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London Greater London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12168655.4 | 02.03.2007 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | US20060778271P | 02.03.2006 Original published format: US 778271 P | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522749 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/02 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6813 (US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | Mikro-RNA-Expressionsprofil im Zusammenhang mit Bauchspeicheldrüsenkrebs | [2012/46] | English: | MicroRNA expression profile associated with pancreatic cancer | [2012/46] | French: | Profil d'expression de micro-ARN associé au cancer du pancréas | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07757822.7 / EP1991706 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070757822) is 11.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005078139 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * see whole doc. esp. claims *; | [E]WO2007081680 (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * see whole doc. esp. claims and Table 3 *; | [I] - JIANG JINMAI ET AL, "Real-time expression profiling of microRNA precursors in human cancer cell lines", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, vol. 33, no. 17, doi:10.1093/NAR/GKI863, ISSN 1362-4962, (20050101), pages 5394 - 5403, (20050928), XP002489966 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gki863 | [I] - VOLINIA STEFANO ET AL, "A microRNA expression signature of human solid tumors defines cancer gene targets", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20060214), vol. 103, no. 7, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0510565103, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2257 - 2261, XP002460699 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0510565103 | by applicant | US4235871 | US4501728 | US4837028 | US4920016 | US4987071 | US5019369 | EP0430402 | US5093246 | US5139941 | US5252479 | WO9324641 | WO9413788 | US5427916 | US5849902 | US6232068 | US2002086356 | US2002173478 | US2004014113 | US2004018176 | US2005277139 | US2006078924 | - FUKUSHIMA, N. ET AL., CANCER BIOL THER., (2003), vol. 2, pages 78 - 83 | - ROSTY, C. ET AL., HEMATOL ONCOL CLIN NORTH AM., (2002), vol. 16, pages 37 - 52 | - MATSUBAYASHI, H. ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 11, pages 573 - 583 | - GRONBORG, M. ET AL., JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 1042 - 1055 | - HEID ET AL., "Real time quantitative PCR", GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 10, pages 986 - 994 | - GIBSON ET AL., "A novel method for real time quantitative RT-PCR", GENOME RES, (1996), vol. 10, pages 995 - 1001, XP000642796 | - JIANG, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, pages 5394 - 5403 | - SCHMITTGEN T. D. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, page E43 | - MA YJ ET AL., RNASE PROTECTION ASSAY, METHODS, (1996), vol. 10, pages 273 - 8 | - GRIFFITHS-JONES, S., "The microRNA Registry", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2004), vol. 32, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkh023, pages D109 - 11, XP002392427 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkh023 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning, A Laboratory Manual | - ALBERTSON, EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 1227 - 1234 | - PINKEL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 9138 - 9142 | - CHOO,, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1994), vol. 33 | - WU; WALLACE, GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, page 560 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, page 1077 | - BARRINGER ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 89, page 117 | - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 1173 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC NAT ACAD SCI, USA, vol. 87, page 1874 | - POLLACK ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1999), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 41 - 6 | - ZENG ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2002), vol. 9, pages 1327 - 1333 | - TUSCHL, NAT. BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 446 - 448 | - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 553 | - MIYAGISHI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 497 - 500 | - PADDISON ET AL., GENES DEV., (2002), vol. 16, pages 948 - 958 | - LEE ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 500 - 505 | - PAUL ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 505 - 508 | - RABINOWITZ, J.E. ET AL., J. VIROL., (2002), vol. 76, pages 791 - 801 | - DORNBURG, GENE THERAP., (1995), vol. 2, pages 301 - 310 | - EGLITIS, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 608 - 614 | - MILLER, HUM. GENE THERAP., (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14 | - ANDERSON, NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, pages 25 - 30 | - XIA ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2002), vol. 20, pages 1006 - 1010 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, pages 3096 - 3101 | - FISHER ET AL., J. VIRAL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 520 - 532 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3826 | - JONES PA; BAYLIN SB, "The fundamental role of epigenetic events in cancer", NAT REV GENET., (2005), vol. 3, pages 415 - 28, XP008042555 | - KRUTZFELDT J ET AL., "Silencing of microRNAs in vivo with 'antagomirs", NATURE, (2005), vol. 438, no. 7068, pages 685 - 9 | - RYLOVA ET AL., CANCER RES, (2002), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 801 - 8 | - SHIM ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2001), vol. 94, no. 1, pages 6 - 15 | - MISCHIATI ET AL., INT. J. MOL. MED., (2002), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 633 - 9 | - MORISHITA ET AL., ANN. N Y ACAD. SCI., (2001), vol. 947, pages 294 - 301 | - ANDRATSCHKE ET AL., ANTICANCER RES, (2001), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 3541 - 3550 | - STEIN; CHENG, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1004 | - ROSSI, CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 469 - 471 | - WERNER; UHLENBECK, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 2092 - 96 | - HAMMANN ET AL., ANTISENSE AND NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (1999), vol. 9, pages 25 - 31 | - JONES PA; BAYLIN SB., "The fundamental role of epigenetic events in cancer", NAT REV GENET., (2005), vol. 3, pages 415 - 28, XP008042555 | - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467 | - GABIZON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., U.S.A., (1988), vol. 18, pages 6949 - 53 | - JIANG, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2005), vol. 33, pages 5394 - 5403 | - SCHMITTGEN T. D. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2004), vol. 32, page E43 | - LEE ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2006), vol. 120, pages 1046 - 1054 | - IMBEAUD, S. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2005), vol. 33, page E56 | - EISEN MB ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 14863 - 8 | - SAEED AI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2003), vol. 34, pages 374 - 8 | - KIM ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 2087 - 92 | - TIBSHIRANI R ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 6567 - 72 | - RUBIE C ET AL., MOL CELL PROBES, (2005), vol. 19, pages 101 - 9 | - POY MN ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 432, pages 226 - 30 | - LAU NC ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, pages 858 - 62 | - SCHMITTGEN TD ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2004), vol. 32, page E43 | - CHEN, C. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2005), vol. 33, page E179 | - POY M. N. ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 432, pages 226 - 30 | - NUOVO GJ ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 12754 - 9 | US20050656109 |