EP2535684 - Laser system for producing a laser marking on a surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dang, Lieu-Kim Stegstrasse 9 9473 Gams / CH | 02 /
Wuersch, Christoph Im Städtli 13 9470 Werdenberg / CH | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2014/37] |
Former [2012/51] | Söllner, Oliver Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 12168989.7 | 23.05.2012 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | DE20111077508 | 14.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011077508 | [2012/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2535684 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2535684 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2012/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lasersystem zum Erzeugen einer Lasermarkierung auf einem Untergrund | [2012/51] | English: | Laser system for producing a laser marking on a surface | [2012/51] | French: | Système laser destiné à générer un marquage laser sur une surface | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 14.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2207827 (DEMAG AG) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,12-14 * page 1 - page 5; figures 2,3 * [I] 4,7-9,11; | [XI]DE3827459 (KORTE MICHAEL H DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-14 * column 3 - column 5; figure 1 * [I] 7-9; | [XI]DE69427087T (LEVELITE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11,14 * page 14 - page 16 * * page 21 - page 23; figures 14A -14D * [I] 5-9,12-14; | [X]EP1096224 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,3-6,10,14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0051] * |