EP2538082 - Gear pump with variable delivery volume [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogt, Guenther Gewerbering 15 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
Hammer, Uwe Obere Tiefenbachstr. 20 83734 Hausham / DE | [2012/52] | Application number, filing date | 12169014.3 | 23.05.2012 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | DE20111077949 | 22.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011077949 | [2012/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2538082 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2538082 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2538082 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/14, F04C14/20 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
F04C2/14 (EP);
F04C14/265 (EP);
F04C15/0042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2012/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zahnradpumpe mit variabel Fördervolume | [2012/52] | English: | Gear pump with variable delivery volume | [2012/52] | French: | Pompe à engrenages avec un volume de pompage variable | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2012 | AL | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | MT | 11.07.2018 | NL | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | PT | 11.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.05.2012 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
MT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.05.2012 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | |
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 11.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4253803 (WORMMEESTER JOHAN G, et al) [X] 1-3,6 * column 2, lines 17-27; figure 1 * [Y] 4,7,8,10 [I] 9; | [Y]US2007140886 (BAXTER RALPH W JR [US], et al) [Y] 4 * figure 3a *; | [Y]EP2078860 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 7,8,10 * sentences 50-54, paragraph 21; figure 1 *; | [X]US2642001 (DALE VERNON F, et al) [X] 1-3,6 * column 1, lines 15-18; figures 1-3 * | Examination | US5417556 |