Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013005870 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213531810 | 25.06.2012 | US201161503174 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101389765B | Global Dossier | 29.04.2014 | B1 | KR20130004163 | 09.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161503174 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102850956 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161503174 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2778045 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2016 | C | CA2778045 | 30.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161503174 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2540773 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2020 | B1 | EP2540773 | 02.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161503174 | 30.06.2011 |