EP2530539 - Systems and methods to configure alerts for fieldbus foundation devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karaffa, John Michael 1501 Roanoke Boulevard Salem, VA Virginia 24153-6422 / US | 02 /
Downor Johnny Stephen 1501 Roanoke Boulevard Salem, VA Virginia 24153-6422 / US | 03 /
Smith, Stephen William 1501 Roanoke Boulevard Salem, VA Virginia 24153-6422 / US | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Jens Peter, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Picker, Madeline Margaret GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12169924.3 | 30.05.2012 | [2012/49] | Priority number, date | US201113149789 | 31.05.2011 Original published format: US201113149789 | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2530539 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2530539 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/409 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
G05B19/409 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31121 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31135 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | G05B19/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Konfiguration von Warnungen für Foundation-Feldbusvorrichtungen | [2012/49] | English: | Systems and methods to configure alerts for fieldbus foundation devices | [2012/49] | French: | Systèmes et procédés pour configurer les alertes des dispositifs de bus de champ foundation | [2012/49] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007239351 (SHERRILL THOMAS D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0024] , [0032] , [0036] , [0037] , [0039] , [0040] , [0056] , [0058] , [0059] , [0063] , [0064] , [0067] , [0086] , [0087]; figures 1,3 * [I] 4-6,10-15; | [XAI]US2002163427 (ERYUREK EVREN [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] - [0050] - [0052] - [0054] , [0056] , [0062] , [0083] - [0085]; figures 1,7 * [A] 2,3,6,9-11,13,15 [I] 4,5,12,14; | [A]US2009055457 (MILLER JOHN P [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0010] , [0059]; figure 6 * |