EP2534987 - Pile fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tricol. Japan Co., Ltd. 12-5, 1-chome, Senba-Higashi Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0035 / JP | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATANI, Motohisa c/o TRICOL. JAPAN CO., LTD. 12-5, 1-chome, Senba-Higashi, Mino-shi Osaka, 562-0035 / JP | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | Application number, filing date | 12169989.6 | 30.05.2012 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | JP20110147735 | 15.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011147735 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2534987 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/02, A47L13/16, D03D27/08, D04B1/04, D04B21/04, A47L13/20 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
D03D27/08 (EP);
D03D27/00 (KR);
D03D15/217 (KR);
D03D15/225 (KR);
D03D15/235 (KR);
D03D15/283 (KR);
D03D15/33 (EP,KR);
D03D15/40 (KR);
D03D15/567 (EP);
D10B2201/00 (EP);
D10B2201/01 (KR);
D10B2201/02 (KR);
D10B2201/08 (KR);
D10B2201/20 (EP,KR);
D10B2211/02 (EP);
D10B2211/04 (EP,KR);
D10B2321/08 (KR);
D10B2331/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Polgewebe | [2012/51] | English: | Pile fabric | [2012/51] | French: | Tissu à poils | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IP]CN201952584U ; | [IP]JP3170003U ; | [A]US3030691 (LAW MARVIN A) [A] 1-6 * column 1, lines 1-21; figure 5.10; claim - *; | [A]JPH0327149 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH0770875 (UCHIBORI TAORU KK) [AD] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]WO9610946 (ACTUELLE TRICOT I BORAS AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 7 - page 7, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0024953 (VOSSEN FROTTIERWEBEREI [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000170056 (MATSUFUJI TERII KK) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [Y]US2004224121 (SHEPPARD JAMES MELVIN [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0038] , [0044]; figure 3; claims 1-8,15-19 * * abstract *; | [A]US2007269630 (SILVER SCOTT H [US]) [A] 1-6 * figure -; claims 1-12 *; | [A]JP2008079912 (KOWA CO) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [IY]CN102071517 (HONGWEI DUAN) [I] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6; | [IP] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 64, Database accession no. 2011-M09094, XP002684922 & CN201952584U U 20110831 (WEIFANG TRICOL TRADING CO LTD) [IP] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0057]; figure -; claim - * | [IP] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 61, Database accession no. 2011-L24355, XP002684923 & JP3170003U U 20110901 (TRICOL JAPAN KK) [IP] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * claim - * | by applicant | JPH0770875 |