Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10292931 | ![]() | 21.05.2019 | B2 | US2010256159 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101493370B | ![]() | 13.02.2015 | B1 | KR20100038112 | 12.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5426548B | ![]() | 26.02.2014 | B2 | JP2010534703 | 11.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL203167 | ![]() | 31.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2182920 | ![]() | 26.12.2012 | B1 | EP2182920 | 12.05.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2692975 | ![]() | 12.01.2016 | C | CA2692975 | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008281858B | ![]() | 27.02.2014 | B2 | AU2008281858 | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2494955 | ![]() | 21.01.2015 | B1 | EP2494955 | 03.10.2012 | A3 | EP2494955 | 05.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08775278 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0814658 | 18.02.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101784257B | 28.11.2012 | B | CN101784257 | 21.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116189T | 08.02.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12170235 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2182920T | 04.03.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2494955T | 13.04.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08775278 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA016822 | 30.07.2012 | B1 | EA201070194 | 30.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2399569T | 02.04.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1138207 | 20.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20150349T | 22.05.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12170235 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010001092 | 01.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2182920T | 31.05.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08775278 | 22.07.2008 | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2494955T | 30.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08775278 | 22.07.2008 | EP12170235 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2182920T | 30.04.2013 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP08775278 | 22.07.2008 | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2494955T | 30.04.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12170235 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA102376 | 10.07.2013 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP59605 | 22.07.2008 | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009016069 | ![]() | 14.05.2009 | A4 | WO2009016069 | 19.03.2009 | A3 | WO2009016069 | 05.02.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR068327 | 11.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2531241T | 12.03.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GEP20125525 | 25.05.2012 | B | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1176280 | 26.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20071573 | 01.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2182920E | 07.03.2013 | E | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2494955E | 04.03.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG183659 | 27.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20071573 | 31.07.2007 | Type | ![]() | EP2182920 |