EP2669563 - Pipe connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uponor Innovation AB P.O. Box 101 73061 Virsbo / SE | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Savolainen, Mika c/o Uponor Suomi Oy Group Patent Services P.O. Box 21 15561 Nastola / FI | 02 /
Rotso, Vesa c/o Uponor Suomi Oy Group Patent Services P.O. Box 21 15561 Nastola / FI | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2013/49] | Application number, filing date | 12170438.1 | 01.06.2012 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669563 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/088 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
F16L37/0885 (EP,US);
F16L37/0926 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rohrverbindung | [2013/49] | English: | Pipe connector | [2013/49] | French: | Raccord de tuyau | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDAY]WO2008148728 (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [ID] 5,7 * page 2, line 13 - page 5, line 22 * * page 10, line 21 - page 12, line 31; figure - * [A] 13 [Y] 1-4,6,8,9; | [YA]US5102170 (INOUE NOBORU [JP]) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 13 * * column 3, line 8 - line 40 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 37; figures 1-4c * [A] 5-7,10-13; | [YD]EP1122485 (HIGASHIO MECH CO LTD [JP], et al) [YD] 6 * column 6, line 50 - line 58 *; | [X]EP0849519 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [X] 10-13 * column 6, line 51 - column 8, line 10; figures 3-3c * | by applicant | EP1122485 | EP1662190 | WO2008148728 |