EP2538409 - Noise reduction method for multi-microphone audio equipment, in particular for a hands-free telephony system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrot 174 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fox, Charles 4 rue du Douanier Rousseau 75014 PARIS / FR | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12170874.7 | 05.06.2012 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | FR20110055377 | 20.06.2011 Original published format: FR 1155377 | [2012/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2538409 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2538409 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/0208, H04R3/00 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
G10L21/0208 (EP,US);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
G10L19/0204 (EP,US);
G10L2021/02082 (EP,US);
G10L2021/02166 (EP,US);
G10L21/0232 (EP,US);
G10L25/06 (EP,US);
G10L25/18 (EP,US);
G10L25/78 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/52] | G10L21/02, H04R3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Geräuschdämpfung für Audio-Gerät mit mehreren Mikrofonen, insbesondere für eine telefonische Freisprechanlage | [2012/52] | English: | Noise reduction method for multi-microphone audio equipment, in particular for a hands-free telephony system | [2012/52] | French: | Procédé de débruitage pour équipement audio multi-microphones, notamment pour un système de téléphonie "mains libres" | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 23.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2012 | AL | 28.08.2013 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | HR | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MK | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | RS | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | SM | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | NO | 28.11.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 28.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004150558 (LI JIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [AD]EP2309499 (PARROT [FR]) [AD] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [A] - COHEN I ET AL, "Speech enhancement based on a microphone array and log-spectral amplitude estimation", ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS IN ISRAEL, 2002. THE 22ND CONVENT ION OF DEC. 1, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020101), ISBN 978-0-7803-7693-9, pages 4 - 6, XP010631024 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [AD] - HENDRIKS R C ET AL, "On Optimal Multichannel Mean-Squared Error Estimators for Speech Enhancement", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20091001), vol. 16, no. 10, doi:10.1109/LSP.2009.2026205, ISSN 1070-9908, pages 885 - 888, XP011269912 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LSP.2009.2026205 | by applicant | WO2007099222 | EP2293594 | EP2309499 | - R. C. HENDRIKS ET AL., "On optimal multichannel mean-squared error estimators for speech enhancement", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, (2009), vol. 16, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/LSP.2009.2026205, XP011269912 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LSP.2009.2026205 | - COHEN, "Optimal Speech Enhancement Under Signal Presence Uncertainty Using Log-Spectral Amplitude Estimator", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, (200204), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/97.1001645, pages 113 - 116, XP011433542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/97.1001645 | - COHEN; B. BERDUGO, "Two-Channel Signal Detection and Speech Enhancement Based on the Transient Beam-to-Reference Ratio", PROC. ICASSP 2003, HONG-KONG, (200304), pages 233 - 236 | - B. WIDROW, Adaptative Filters, Aspect of Network and System The- ory, HOLT, RINEHART AND WINSTON, (1970), pages 563 - 587 | - COHEN, "Optimal Speech Enhancement Under Signal Presence Uncertainty Using Log-Spectral Amplitude Estimator", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, (200204), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/97.1001645, XP011433542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/97.1001645 |