EP2672197 - Mounting assembly for mounting plate-like bodies to the roof of a building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hörmann Energietechnik GmbH & Co. KG Rudolf-Hörmann-Strasse 1 86807 Buchloe / DE | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merz, Bruno Kettenschwangerstraße 27 87668 Rieden / DE | 02 /
Heinzler, Elmar Alte Gasse 4a 86875 Waal / DE | 03 /
Frömel, Martin Römerweg 10 87742 Dirlewang / DE | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte mbB Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12170958.8 | 06.06.2012 | [2013/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672197 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/52, E04D3/35 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
F24S25/67 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Montageanordnung zur dachseitigen Montage von Flächenkörpern an einem Bauwerk | [2013/50] | English: | Mounting assembly for mounting plate-like bodies to the roof of a building | [2013/50] | French: | Agencement de montage pour le montage sur le toit de corps de surface sur une construction | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 07.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.08.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.08.2014 | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11222991 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1,2,6,7,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]JP2011035254 (SHARP KK) [A] 1,2,6-11,15 * abstract *; | [Y]KR100928950B (HANBITKIJEON CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]KR101016793B (ENERGY CO LTD S [KR]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE29606547U |