EP2535682 - Method and device for determining the surface topography of coated, reflective surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leibniz-Institut für Polymerforschung Dresden e.V. Hohe Strasse 6 01069 Dresden / DE | For all designated states Plastic Logic Limited 296 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 OFX / GB | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calvimontes, Alfredo Kaitzer Strasse 42 01187 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Lederer, Kay Boltenhagener Strasse 3 01109 Dresden / DE | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Bienertstrasse 15 01187 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte, Bienertstrasse 15 01187 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 12171156.8 | 07.06.2012 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | DE20111077567 | 15.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011077567 | [2012/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2535682 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2535682 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/06, G01B11/24, G01B11/30 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
G01B11/0675 (EP,US);
G01B11/245 (RU);
G01B11/0625 (EP,US);
G01B11/24 (EP,US);
G01B11/30 (EP,US);
G01N21/88 (RU);
G01B2210/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/51] | G01B11/06, G01B11/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung der Oberflächentopografie von beschichteten, reflektierenden Oberflächen | [2012/51] | English: | Method and device for determining the surface topography of coated, reflective surfaces | [2012/51] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détermination de la topographie de surfaces revêtues et réfléchissantes | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 28.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1805477 (UNIV STUTTGART [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * the whole document * [I] 2-4; | [XPI]DE102010016462 (UNIV MUENCHEN TECH [DE]) [XP] 5-7 * the whole document * [I] 1-4; | [I] - FLORIAN HIRTH ET AL, "Depth-sensitive thin film reflectometer;Depth-sensitive thin film reflectometer", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20101022), vol. 21, no. 12, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/21/12/125301, ISSN 0957-0233, page 125301, XP020201536 [I] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/21/12/125301 | [A] - ARTIGAS R ET AL, "Dual-technology optical sensor head for 3D surface shape measurements on the micro and nano-scales", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, (20040427), vol. 5457, doi:10.1117/12.545701, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 166 - 174, XP002334080 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.545701 | by applicant | US5856871 | US7324210 | - A. FACCHETTI ET AL., ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2005), vol. 17, pages 1705 - 1725 | - J. C. ANDERSON, THIN SOLID FILMS, (1976), vol. 38, pages 151 - 161 | - J. VERES ET AL., ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, (2003), vol. 13-3, pages 199 - 204 | - S.W. KIM ET AL., APPLIED OPTICS, (1999), vol. 38-28, pages 5968 - 5973 | - H.W. SHABANA, POLYMER TESTING, (2004), vol. 23, pages 695 - 702 | - J.S. HILL, J. PHYS. D: APPL. PHYS., (1971), vol. 4, pages 741 - 747 | - K. ZALAMOVA ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (2006), vol. 18, pages 5897 - 5906 | - A. K. RUPRECHT ET AL., INTERNAT. KOLL. TU ILMENAU, (200510), vol. 50 | - A. K. RUPRECHT ET AL., PROC. SPIE - INT. SOC. OPT., (2004), pages 5360 - 61, URL: www.micro-epsilon.com; www.frt-gmbh.com |