EP2498421 - Coherent optical detection and signal processing method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Michael George 8113 Crest Road Laurel, MD 20723 / US | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12171268.1 | 10.12.2003 | [2012/37] | Priority number, date | US20020432500P | 11.12.2002 Original published format: US 432500 P | US20030445742P | 07.02.2003 Original published format: US 445742 P | US20030728247 | 04.12.2003 Original published format: US 728247 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498421 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2498421 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/61, H04B10/64, H04B10/63 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
H04B10/61 (EP,US);
H04B10/614 (EP,US);
H04B10/6161 (EP,US);
H04B10/6162 (EP,US);
H04B10/63 (EP,US);
H04B10/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | H04B10/148, H04B10/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | Kohärente optische Detektion und Signalverarbeitungsverfahren und System | [2013/50] | English: | Coherent optical detection and signal processing method and system | [2012/37] | French: | Procede et systeme de detection optique coherente et de traitement du signal | [2013/50] |
Former [2012/37] | Kohärente optische Detektion und Signalverarbeitungsverfahren und System | ||
Former [2012/37] | Procédé et système de détection optique coherente et de traitement du signal | Examination procedure | 17.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 11.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03812904.5 / EP1570593 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030812904) is 11.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.02.2014 | BE | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
BE | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - KAZOVSKY L ET AL, "Wide-linewidth phase diversity homodyne receivers", J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL. (USA), JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, OCT. 1988, USA, (198810), vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 1527 - 1536, XP002288557 [AD] 1-8 * page 1527, column R, line 29 - page 1528, column R, line 14 * * figure 1 * * page 1529, column R, line 5 - line 40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.7912 | by applicant | US5323258 | - Y. MIYAMOTO, 100 GHZ-SPACED 8X43 GBIT/S DWDM UNREPEATERED TRANSMISSION OVER 163 KM USING DUOBINARY-CARRIER-SUPPRESSED RETURN-TO-ZERO FORMAT | - D. PENNINCKX, THE PHASE-SHAPED BINARY TRANSMISSION (PSBT): A NEW TECHNIQUE TO TRANSMIT FAR BEYOND THE CHROMATIC DISPERSION LIMIT | - H. BULOW, ELECTRONIC PMD MITIGATION-FROM LINEAR EQUALIZATION TO MAXIMUM-LIKELIHOOD DETECTION | - H. BULOW, ELECTRONIC EQUALIZATION OF TRANSMISSION IMPAIRMENTS | - H. F. HAUNSTEIN, DESIGN OF NEAR OPTIMUM ELECTRICAL EQUALIZERS FOR OPTICAL TRANSMISSION IN THE PRESENCE OF PMD | - O. AGAZZI, DSP-BASED EQUALIZATION FOR OPTICAL CHANNELS-FEASIBILITY OF VLSI IMPLEMENTATION | - J.M. KAHN, 1 GBIT/S ZERO-IF DPSK COHERENT OPTICAL SYSTEM USING A SINGLE PHOTODETECTOR | - L.G. KAZOVSKY, PHASE- AND POLARIZATION-DIVERSITY COHERENT OPTICAL TECHNIQUES | - L.G. KAZOVSKY, WIDE-LINEWIDTH PHASE DIVERSITY HOMODYNE RECEIVERS | - T. OKOSHI; YAMASHITA, DOUBLE-STAGE PHASE-DIVERSITY OPTICAL RECEIVER: ANALYSIS AND EXPERIMENTAL CONFIRMATION OF THE PRINCIPLE | - B. ENNING, SIGNAL PROCESSING IN AN OPTICAL POLARIZATION DIVERSITY FOR 560-MBIT/S ASK HETERODYNE DETECTION | - I. LYUBOMIRSKY, INTERPLAY OF FIBER NON-LINEARITY AND OPTICAL FILTERING IN ULTRA-DENSE WDM | - W. IDLER, 0.8 BIT/S HZ OF INFORMATION SPECTRAL DENSITY BY VESTIGIAL SIDEBAND FILTERING OF 42.66 GB/S NRZ | - K. IWASHITA, CHROMATIC DISPERSION COMPENSATION IN COHERENT OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS | - O. AGAZZI; V. GOPINATHAN; K. PARHI; K. KOTA; A. PHANSE, "DSP-Based Equalization for Optical Channels - Feasibility of VLSI Imple-mentation", IEEE 802.3AE 10 GB/S, (20000912), URL: www.ieee802.org/3/ae/public/sep00 | - M.C. BRAIN; M.J. CREANER; R.C. STEELE; N.G. WALKER; G.R. WALKER; J. MELLIS; S. AI-CHALABI; J. DAVIDSON; M. RUTHERFORD; I.C. STURGE, "Progress towards the field deployment of coherent optical fiber systems", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1990), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/50.50739, pages 423 - 437, XP000136405 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.50739 | - B. ENNING; R.S. VODHANEL; E. DIETRICH; P. PATZAK; P. MEISSNER; G. WENKE, "Signal processing in an optical polarization diversity for 560-Mbit/s ASK heterodyne detection", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., vol. 7, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/50.16881, XP000003219 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.16881 | - I.M.I. HABBAB; L.J. CIMINI, "Polarization switching techniques for coherent optical communications", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1988), vol. 6, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/50.7913, pages 1537 - 1548, XP000009769 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.7913 | - K. IWASHITA; N. TAKACHIO, "Chromatic dispersion compensation in coherent optical communications", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1990), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/50.50733, pages 367 - 375, XP000136400 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.50733 | - J.M. KAHN; I.M.I. HABBAB; C.R. GILES, "1 Gbit/s zero-IF DPSK coherent optical system using a single photodetector", IEE ELECTRON. LETT., (1988), vol. 24, no. 23, pages 1455 - 1457 | - F.P. KAPRON, "Systems considerations for polarization-mode dispersion", NFOEC '97 CONFERENCE, (1997), pages 433 - 444 | - L.G. KAZOVSKY, "Phase- and polarization-diversity coherent optical techniques", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1989), vol. 7, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1109/50.17768, pages 279 - 292, XP000006110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.17768 | - L.G. KAZOVSKY; R. WELTER; A.F. ELRAFAIE; W. SESSA, "Wide-linewidth phase diversity homodyne receivers", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1988), vol. 6, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/50.7912, pages 1527 - 1536, XP002288557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.7912 | - T. MATSUDA; A. NAKA; S. SAITO, "Comparison between NRZ and RZ signal formats for in-line amplifier transmission in the zero-dispersion regime", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1998), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/50.661359, pages 340 - 348, XP000751381 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.661359 | - Y. MIYAMOTO; K. YONENAGA; A. HIRANO; H. TOBA; K. MURATA; H. MIYAZAWA, "100 GHz-spaced 8x43 Gbit/s DWDM unrepeatered transmission over 163 km using duobinary-carrier-suppressed return-to-zero format", IEE ELECTRON. LETT., (2001), vol. 37, no. 23, doi:doi:10.1049/el:20010957, pages 1395 - 1396, XP006017538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20010957 | - R. NOE; H.J. RODLER; A. EBBERG; G. GAUKEL; B. NOLL; J. WITTMAN; F. AURACHER, "Comparison of polarization handling methods in coherent optical systems", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1991), vol. 9, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/50.90934, pages 1353 - 1366, XP000241894 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.90934 | - S. NORIMATSU; K. IWASHITA, "Linewidth requirements for optical synchronous detection systems with nonnegligible loop delay time", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1992), vol. 10, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/50.124497, pages 349 - 341, XP000272894 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.124497 | - T. OKOSHI; S. YAMASHITA, "Double-stage phase-diversity optical receiver: Analysis and experimental confirmation of the principle", IEEE J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (1990), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/50.50734, pages 376 - 384, XP000136401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.50734 | - D. PENNINCKX; M. CHBAT; L. PIERRE; J.-P. THIERY, "The phase-shaped binary transmission (PSBT): a new technique to transmit far beyond the chromatic dispersion limit", IEEE PHOT. TECH. LETT., (1997), vol. 9, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/68.553112, pages 259 - 261, XP000683883 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.553112 | - J. POIRRIER; F. BUCHALI; H. BULOW, "Electronic WDM crosstalk cancellation", ECOC 2001 CONFERENCE, (2001), pages 94 - 95, XP010582831 | - K. YONENAGA; S. NORIMATSU, "Dispersion compensation for homodyne detection systems using a 10-Gb/s optical PSK-VSB signal", IEEE PHOT. TECH. LETT., (1995), vol. 7, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/68.404018, pages 929 - 590, XP000527483 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.404018 |