EP2674322 - Vehicle seat with a passenger protection function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | 17.12.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation Intellectual Property VAK - HBBVN 40 531 Göteborg / SE | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jonsson, Tony Långaredsvägen 246 44191 Alingsås / SE | 02 /
Björklund, Magnus Soldatvägen 79 42349 Torslanda / SE | [2013/51] | Application number, filing date | 12171452.1 | 11.06.2012 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2674322 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/42, B60N2/427 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
B60N2/4228 (EP);
B60N2/42709 (EP);
B60N2/42745 (EP);
B60N2/682 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitz mit Passagierschutzfunktion | [2013/51] | English: | Vehicle seat with a passenger protection function | [2013/51] | French: | Siège de véhicule doté d'une fonction de protection de passagers | [2013/51] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102009002825 (SITECH SITZTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,8 * paragraphs [0038] - [0063]; figures 1,2A,2B * [I] 7; | [XI]WO9729923 (RENAULT [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 16; figures 2-4 * [I] 4; | [XI]EP2179887 (TS TECH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * paragraphs [0024] - [0059] - [0066] - [0076]; figures 2-6 * [I] 7; | [XI]JPH10278644 (TACHI S CO) [X] 1-3,6,8 * abstract * [I] 4,5,7; | [XI]DE102006003651 (FAURECIA AUTOSITZE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022]; figures 1-5 * [I] 3,5,7 | by applicant | WO0053452 |