EP2541024 - APU fuel system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagshenas, Behzad 17103 Carranza Drive San Diego, CA California 92127 / US | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2013/01] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns 10 Salisbury Square London Greater London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12171531.2 | 11.06.2012 | [2013/01] | Priority number, date | US201113169541 | 27.06.2011 Original published format: US201113169541 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2541024 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2541024 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2541024 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/236 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
F02C7/236 (EP,US);
F05D2220/50 (EP,US);
F05D2260/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2013/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | APU-Kraftstoffsystem und Verfahren | [2013/01] | English: | APU fuel system and method | [2013/01] | French: | Procédé et système de fourniture de carburant pour APU | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 03.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2012 | AL | 11.10.2017 | AT | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | RS | 11.10.2017 | SE | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | IE | 11.06.2018 | LU | 11.06.2018 | MT | 11.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5020314 (BROPHY SEAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 5 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007284480 (ATKEY WARREN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0038]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010089026 (BAKER CARTHEL C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * |