Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
26.01.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.08.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.06.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.04.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
12.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.02.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |