EP2535243 - Engine protection system relative to a filler cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd. Cranfield Technology Park Moulsoe Road Cranfield Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinch, Tim Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd, IP Department Cranfield Technology Park Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK430DB / GB | 02 /
Strachan, Kenneth Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd, IP Department Cranfield Technology Park Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK430DB / GB | [2012/51] | Application number, filing date | 12171651.8 | 12.06.2012 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | GB20110009903 | 14.06.2011 Original published format: GB 201109903 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2535243 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2535243 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/12, B62D25/08 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
B62D25/12 (EP,GB);
B60K15/0406 (GB);
B62D25/082 (EP);
F02F7/0068 (GB);
B60R2021/343 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Motorschutzsystem in Verbindung mit einem Verschlusskappe | [2012/51] | English: | Engine protection system relative to a filler cap | [2012/51] | French: | Système de protection de moteur en relation avec un bouchon de réservoir | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 30.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9104885 (HARRISON TERRY W [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 26; figures 1-6 * [Y] 6,9,10; | [Y]DE29800647U (WINDHORST BETEILIGUNGSGESELLSC [DE]) [Y] 6,9,10 * page 6, line 7 - page 9, line 17; figures 1-9 *; | [XY]US5580019 (GLESSER LOUIS S [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 18; figures 1-8 * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]US2005092752 (HAGANO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,11-15 * page 2, paragraph 27 - page 2, paragraph 30; figure 1 * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]US6237798 (SUNG YEOUN-KWAN [KR]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 45; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]DE4027420 (NOHRDEN HEINO [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 65; figure 1 * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]GB2334921 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]US5275249 (NELSON RICHARD L [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * column 2, line 45 - column 6, line 52; figures 1-10 * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]WO2008156192 (KOHNO HIROKAGE [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * abstract * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]JP2006111073 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * abstract * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]JPH04314623 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * abstract * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]JP2009001260 (KONO HIROKAGE) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * abstract * [Y] 6,9,10 |