EP2546519 - Control with radar of airspace around wind turbines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states airspex GmbH Automeile 2 17291 Prenzlau / DE | [2018/28] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states ENERTRAG Systemtechnik GmbH Gut Dauerthal 17291 Dauerthal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dipl.-Ing (FH) Herrholz, Thomas Wiesenstrasse 7 Ortsteil Schwichtenberg 17099 Galenbeck / DE | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/14] |
Former [2013/03] | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12171797.9 | 13.06.2012 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | DE20112050703U | 12.07.2011 Original published format: DE 202011050703 U | [2013/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2546519 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2546519 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2546519 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/10 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
F03D80/10 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2013/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung mit wenigstens einer Windenergieanlage | [2018/13] | English: | Control with radar of airspace around wind turbines | [2013/03] | French: | Contrôle de l'espace aérien d'éoliennes avec radar | [2017/46] |
Former [2013/03] | Luftraumüberwachung von Windturbinen mittels Radar | ||
Former [2013/03] | Contrôle avec radar de l'espace aérien d'éoliennes | Examination procedure | 08.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 02.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2012 | AL | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | IT | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | MT | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | RS | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | AT | 13.06.2018 | IE | 13.06.2018 | LU | 13.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.06.2012 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MK | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 13.06.2012 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4746924 (LIGHTFOOT FRED M [US]) [A] 1* column 1, lines 20-40 *; | [Y]DE202004006595U (UCKERWERK ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008088508 (SMITH ALEXANDER E [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0056] , [0057] *; | [A]US2009034259 (LAUFER ERIC DAVID [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] *; | [XYI]US2010194603 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * paragraph [0032] * [Y] 11 [I] 5,6,8-10; | [Y]WO2010133541 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * page 8, lines 3-24 * | by applicant | DE20103294U | WO03104648 | DE202004006595U | EP1486798 |