EP2546590 - Nozzle wall element for a cooling tunnel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pumpe, Rainer Klaus Tiroler Strasse 27a 95448 Bayreuth / DE | [2013/03] | Application number, filing date | 12171953.8 | 14.06.2012 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | DE20111079132 | 14.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011079132 | DE20111080807 | 11.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011080807 | [2013/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2546590 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2546590 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/00, F25D17/06, // F25D17/04 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
F25D17/005 (EP);
F25D17/06 (EP);
F25D17/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | F25D17/00, F25D17/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Düsenwandelement für einen Kühltunnel | [2013/03] | English: | Nozzle wall element for a cooling tunnel | [2013/03] | French: | Buse de paroi pour tunnel de refroidissement | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 13.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE29900870U (RUD OTTO MEYER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9-11 * page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1 * [I] 3,4,8; | [A]GB1425717 (BURGER EISENWERKE AG) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-8 *; | [A]FR2498429 (CARBOXYQUE FRANCAISE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3688518 (GOLTSOS COSTAS E) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [E]WO2013060586 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,5-7,9,10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE202006015362U | DE102009045146 | DE10017408 | EP1455151 | DE102008040353 |