EP2614839 - Method for using BOC/CDO to modulate hedgehog signaling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | For all designated states Curis, Inc. 4 Maguire Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
For all designated states Curis, Inc. 4 Maguire Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Sauvage, Frederic, J. 187 Shooting Star Isle Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 02 /
Tian, Hua 2548 Post Street San Francisco, CA California 94115 / US | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12171968.6 | 22.01.2007 | [2013/29] | Priority number, date | US20060789645P | 05.04.2006 Original published format: US 789645 P | US20060061942P | 12.12.2006 Original published format: US 61942 P | [2013/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2614839 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2614839 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, G01N33/50 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
G01N33/57484 (EP);
A61K38/1774 (EP);
A61K47/6809 (EP);
A61K47/6817 (EP);
A61K47/6849 (EP);
A61K47/6899 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2013/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwendung von BOC/CDO zur Modulation der Hedgehog-Signalisierung | [2013/29] | English: | Method for using BOC/CDO to modulate hedgehog signaling | [2013/29] | French: | Méthode d'utilisation du BOC/CDO pour moduler l'émission des signaux du hedgehog | [2013/29] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07749114.0 / EP2007428 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070749114) is 07.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0230462 (CURIS INC [US], et al); | [X]US2003064443 (BAKER KEVIN P [US], et al) | by applicant | US3773919 | US3896111 | US4137230 | US4151042 | EP0003089 | US4248870 | US4256746 | US4260608 | WO8101145 | US4265814 | US4275149 | US4294757 | US4307016 | US4308268 | US4308269 | US4309428 | US4313946 | US4315929 | US4317821 | US4322348 | US4331598 | USRE30985E | US4353888 | US4361650 | US4362663 | US4364866 | US4371533 | EP0073657 | US4399216 | US4424219 | US4426330 | US4450254 | EP0117060 | EP0117058 | WO8403506 | WO8403564 | US4485045 | EP0139383 | US4534899 | US4544545 | EP0183070 | US4657966 | US4676980 | EP0244234 | US4708871 | US4709871 | US4767704 | WO8807378 | EP0307247 | US4816567 | DD266710 | US4833092 | WO8905859 | GB2211504 | US4892538 | EP0362179 | WO9003430 | EP0367761 | US4927762 | US4933092 | US4933294 | US4943529 | US4946783 | WO9010048 | US4955892 | WO9010448 | EP0394538 | WO9013646 | WO9013641 | US4975278 | EP0402226 | WO9100360 | WO9100357 | WO9105264 | WO9104753 | US5010182 | US5013556 | WO9106629 | WO9110741 | US5041138 | US5053394 | US5092871 | US5106627 | US5108921 | US5122469 | WO9220373 | US5208020 | US5209020 | WO9308829 | US5213804 | US5223409 | US5227170 | US5229275 | WO9316185 | WO9321232 | US5264221 | WO9325673 | US5283187 | WO9404690 | WO9411026 | EP0600517 | US5354844 | US5356633 | US5364934 | US5395619 | US5401638 | US5403484 | US5416064 | US5416016 | US5417978 | US5427908 | US5428130 | US5432018 | WO9518856 | US5459127 | US5462854 | US5469854 | WO9534683 | US5498538 | US5498530 | WO9607321 | US5500362 | US5512295 | US5521291 | WO9616673 | WO9617924 | US5527528 | US5534259 | US5543158 | US5543152 | US5545806 | US5545807 | US5547932 | US5556762 | US5556948 | EP0425235 | US5565332 | US5567610 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571689 | US5571894 | US5573905 | US5580717 | US5580575 | US5583020 | US5587458 | US5591669 | US5591721 | US5595756 | WO9709446 | US5625126 | US5627024 | WO9717852 | US5633425 | US5641870 | US5648237 | US5661016 | US5663143 | WO9733551 | WO9735196 | WO9738731 | WO9746251 | US5698426 | WO9747314 | WO9802463 | US5712374 | US5714586 | US5723286 | US5723323 | US5731169 | US5734018 | WO9814277 | US5739277 | US5739116 | WO9815833 | US5750373 | WO9820169 | WO9820159 | WO9820036 | US5763192 | WO9824893 | US5767285 | US5766905 | US5770701 | US5770710 | US5770434 | US5773001 | US5789199 | US5821337 | WO9845479 | US5837234 | US5840523 | US5869046 | US5877296 | US6248564 | EP1391213 | US2005085519 | US20000193767 | WO2001US10482 | WO2006US19651 |