EP2535138 - High corrosion resistant equipment for a plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishibashi, Ryo c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Katsuhito c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Park, Seunghwan c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Imano, Shinya c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Akahoshi, Haruo c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 06 /
Ohashi, Kenya c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/51] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12171976.9 | 14.06.2012 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | JP20110131796 | 14.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011131796 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2535138 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2535138 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2535138 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/12 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
B23K20/1265 (EP,US);
B23K20/129 (EP,US);
B23K2101/12 (EP,US);
B23K2103/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12389 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | Fabrikanlage mit hoher Korrosionsbeständigkeit | [2012/51] | English: | High corrosion resistant equipment for a plant | [2012/51] | French: | Équipement industriel à haute résistance à la corrosion | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 15.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2012 | AL | 27.04.2016 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | RS | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | IE | 14.06.2016 | LU | 14.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | DE | 03.01.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 14.06.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 14.06.2016 | ||
LU | 14.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.06.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 14.06.2016 | ||
LU | 14.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.06.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 14.06.2016 | ||
LU | 14.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.06.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 14.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 14.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1366417 (KOBE STEEL WORKS) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 *; | [YD]JP2006255711 (TOSHIBA CORP) [YD] 1-8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009]; figures 2-3 * | by applicant | JP3562014B | JP2006255711 | JP2000301363 | JP2002248583 |