Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
20.08.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.12.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |