EP2676733 - Device for separating magnetic and/or magnetisable particles from a suspension and use of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Germany GmbH Schuhstrasse 60 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2015/29] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krieglstein, Wolfgang Von-Fürer-Straße 45 90491 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Ralph Oliver Herzogenauracher Str. 34b 90768 Fürth / DE | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 12172517.0 | 19.06.2012 | [2013/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676733 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/12, B03C1/30, B03D1/24 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
B03C1/12 (EP);
B03C1/247 (EP);
B03C1/30 (EP);
B03D1/24 (EP);
B03C2201/18 (EP);
B03C2201/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abtrennen magnetischer und/oder magnetisierbarer Partikel von einer Suspension und deren Verwendung | [2013/52] | English: | Device for separating magnetic and/or magnetisable particles from a suspension and use of same | [2013/52] | French: | Dispositif de séparation de particules magnétiques et/ou magnétisables d'une suspension et son utilisation | [2013/52] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 02.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5192423 (DUCZMAL TOMASZ [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 4-9; | [XI]US5224604 (DUCZMAL TOMASZ [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 4-9; | [XI]SU1278035 (IR POLT INI PK I OBOGASHCHENIY [SU]) [X] 1-3,10-12 * abstract * [I] 4-9 | by applicant | RU2365421 | WO2006069995 |