Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
28.01.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.12.2017 | Change - classification | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
08.12.2017 | Change - classification | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
06.08.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.07.2017 | Change - classification | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
14.07.2017 | Change - classification | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
05.07.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.06.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.04.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |