EP2631913 - Field-effect transistor with magnetic layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wunderlich, Joerg Hitachi Cambridge Laboratory Cavendish Laboratory JJ Thompson Avenue Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0HE / GB | 02 /
Ferguson, Andrew Microelectronics Research Centre Cavendish Laboratory JJ Thompson Avenue Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0HE / GB | 03 /
Jungwirth, Tomas Institute of Physics ASCR Cukrovarnicka 10 162 53 Praha 6 / CZ | 04 /
Chiara, Chiccarelli Microelectronics Research Centre Cavendish Laboratory JJ Thompson Avenue Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0HE / GB | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12172627.7 | 19.06.2012 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | EP20120157109 | 27.02.2012 Original published format: EP 12157109 | EP20120157773 | 01.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12157773 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2631913 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/16, H01F10/32, H01L29/66, H01L43/08, H01L27/22, H01L43/00 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
G11C11/161 (EP);
H01L29/66984 (EP);
H10N50/00 (EP);
H10N50/20 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | G11C11/16, H01F10/32, H01L29/66, H01L43/08, H01L27/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Feldeffekttransistor mit magnetischer Schicht | [2013/35] | English: | Field-effect transistor with magnetic layer | [2013/35] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ avec une couche magnetique | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5652445 | EP1830410 |