EP2537471 - A surgical fastener having a safety feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holcomb, Matthew D. 2021 Buckeye Field Court Lebanon, OH Ohio 45036 / US | 02 /
Harris, Jason L. 3896 Top Flite Lane Mason, OH Ohio 45040 / US | 03 /
Stokes, Michael J. 8 Sleepy Hollow Lane Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45244 / US | 04 /
Cerier, Jeffrey C. 11 Orchard Street Franklin, MA Massachusetts 02038 / US | 05 /
O'Keefe, Jonathan B. 45 Alton Road North Attleboro, MA Massachusetts 02760 / US | 06 /
Boudreau, Keith D. 16 Noble Hill Road Beverly, MA Massachusetts 01915 / US | 07 /
Zeiner, Mark S. 5897 Trailside Court Mason, OH Ohio 45040 / US | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12172808.3 | 20.06.2012 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | US201113164954 | 21.06.2011 Original published format: US201113164954 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537471 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/068, A61B17/064, // A61B17/04, A61B17/00, A61B17/072, A61B17/29 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A61B17/0684 (EP,BR);
A61B17/0644 (EP,BR);
A61B17/0682 (EP,BR);
A61B2017/00367 (EP);
A61B2017/0053 (EP);
A61B2017/00818 (EP);
A61B2017/0488 (EP);
A61B2017/0645 (EP);
A61B2017/0725 (EP);
A61B2017/2913 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Chirurgische Befestigung mit Sicherheitsfunktion | [2012/52] | English: | A surgical fastener having a safety feature | [2012/52] | French: | Agrafe chirurgicale comportant une fonction de sécurité | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010191255 (CRAINICH LAWRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0189]; figures 1-115 *; | [A]US2010187283 (CRAINICH LAWRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-40 *; | [A]WO2008109876 (CARDICA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP0864297 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 5, line 45 - column 9, line 50; figures 1-15 *; | [A]US4648542 (FOX WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 16 - column 9, line 28; figures 1-14 *; | [E]WO2012103286 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US], et al) [E] 1-5 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0096]; figures 1-43; claim 1 * | by applicant | - MENCHACA ET AL., "Gastric plication: preclinical study of durability of serosa-to-serosa apposition", SURG OBES RELAT DIS, (2011), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/j.soard.2010.11.002, pages 8 - 14, XP028187400 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.soard.2010.11.002 | - BRETHAUER ET AL., "Laparoscopic gastric plication for the treatment of severe obesity", SURG OBES RELAT DIS, (2011), vol. 7, pages 15 - 22 | US20070779314 | US20070779322 | US20080113829 | US20080179600 | US20090359351 | US20090609336 | US20100690311 | US20090359354 | US20090359357 | US20090608860 | US20100690285 |