EP2677557 - Method for bonding LED wafer, method for manufacturing LED chip and bonding structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195 - Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Hsiu-Jen 3F.-6, No.202, Sec. 2, Liujia 5th Rd., Zhubei City 30274 Hsinchu County / TW | 02 /
Lin, Jian-Shian No.6, Alley 6, Lane 199, Sec. 1, Lanfeng Rd. Yilan City 26066 Yilan County / TW | 03 /
Chen, Shau-Yi No.14, Shekou, Xiluo Township 64865 Yunlin County / TW | 04 /
Tsai, Jen-Hui No.28, Lane 155, Shihpin Rd., East District 300 Hsinchu City / TW | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12172934.7 | 21.06.2012 | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2677557 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/62 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
H01L24/27 (EP);
H01L24/29 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP);
H01L33/0093 (EP);
H01L33/0095 (EP);
H01L2224/2745 (EP);
H01L2224/27462 (EP);
H01L2224/29109 (EP);
H01L2224/29113 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/83097 (EP);
H01L2224/83191 (EP);
H01L2224/83207 (EP);
H01L2224/8381 (EP);
H01L2224/83825 (EP);
H01L2224/8383 (EP);
H01L2224/94 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP);
H01L24/94 (EP);
H01L2924/12041 (EP);
H01L2924/12042 (EP);
H01L2924/351 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2745, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/27462, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/29109, H01L2924/01083 (EP);
H01L2224/29113, H01L2924/0103 (EP);
H01L2224/29113, H01L2924/01049 (EP);
H01L2224/29113, H01L2924/0105 (EP);
H01L2224/83207, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/83825, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/8383, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/27 (EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/83 (EP);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bonden eines LED-Wafers, Verfahren zur Herstellung eines LED-Chips und Bondstruktur | [2013/52] | English: | Method for bonding LED wafer, method for manufacturing LED chip and bonding structure | [2013/52] | French: | Procédé de collage de plaquette DEL, procédé de fabrication de puce DEL et structure de collage | [2013/52] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 29.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2328192 (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0006] - [0043]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP2302705 (UNIV IND & ACAD COLLABORATION [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * figure -; claims 11,14 *; | [Y]EP1385215 (NICHIA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * figures 16A-16L; claims 1,5 * |