EP2510875 - Treatment apparatus for applying electrical impulses to the body of a patient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fenzian Limited Winter Hill House Marlow Reach Station approach Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1NT / GB | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colthurst, James 3 Charnham Lane, Hungerford Berkshire, RG17 0EY / GB | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Collins, John David Creation IP Limited Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/42] | Addison, Ann Bridget, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12172993.3 | 28.10.2004 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | GB20040012070 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0412070 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2510875 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2510875 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/053, A61N1/32 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
A61B5/0531 (EP,US);
A61N1/32 (EP,GB,US);
Y10S128/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Behandlungsvorrichtung zum Anlegen elektrischer Impulse an den Körper eines Patienten | [2012/42] | English: | Treatment apparatus for applying electrical impulses to the body of a patient | [2012/42] | French: | Appareil de traitement pour appliquer des impulsions électriques au corps d'un patient | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/08] | 12.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.02.2017 | 22.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04791594.7 / EP1761301 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040791594) is 11.06.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.02.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 13.02.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5339827 (MASOPUST JIRI [CS]); | [A]US6301500 (VAN HERK JOHANNES J [NL], et al); | [A]US2002095080 (CORY PHILIP C [US], et al); |