EP2532678 - HUMAN ANTIBODIES AGAINST IL13 AND THERAPEUTIC USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Emma Michelle Novartis Horsham Research Centre Wimblehurst Road Horsham, West Sussex Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 02 /
Parveen, Sofia Novartis Horsham Research Centre Wimblehurst Road Horsham, West Sussex Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 03 /
Valkirs, Gunars 2893 Paseo Del Sol Escondido, CA 92025 / US | 04 /
Buechler, Joe 1343 Cassins Street Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Kassow, Anders Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Kassow, Anders Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12173002.2 | 19.10.2006 | [2012/50] | Priority number, date | GB20050021509 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: GB 0521509 | GB20060016666 | 22.08.2006 Original published format: GB 0616666 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2532678 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C07K16/24, A61K39/395 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP,US);
C07K16/24 (KR);
A61K38/012 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
C12N15/81 (US);
C12P21/02 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | 12.06.2013 | HR | 12.06.2013 | Title | German: | Menschliche Antikörper gegen IL13 und therapeutische Verwendungen | [2012/50] | English: | HUMAN ANTIBODIES AGAINST IL13 AND THERAPEUTIC USES | [2012/50] | French: | Anticorps humains dirigés contre l'IL-13 et utilisations thérapeutiques | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06806402.1 / EP1957530 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060806402) is 25.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005007699 (CAMBRIDGE ANTIBODY TECH [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 74 * * page 82 *; | [A]WO2005091853 (CENTOCOR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 8; example 1 *; | [YP]WO2005123126 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [YP] 2-7 * page 69 * * page 98 *; | [XP]WO2006055638 (ABGENIX INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-7 * page 67; example 9 *; | [E]WO2006124451 (CENTOCOR INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7 * example 3 *; | [XY] - J RUTH, "INTERLEUKIN 4 AND 13 PARTICIPATION IN MYCOBACTERIAL (type-1) AND SCHISTOSOMAL (type-2) ANTIGEN-ELICITED PULMONARY GRANULOMA FORMATION: MULTIPARAMETER ANALYSIS OF CELLULAR RECRUITMENT, CHEMOKINE EXPRESSION AND CYTOKINE NETWORKS", CYTOKINE, (20000501), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.1006/cyto.1999.0595, ISSN 1043-4666, pages 432 - 444, XP055042648 [X] 1 * figure 3 * [Y] 2-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cyto.1999.0595 | [A] - BLANCHARD C ET AL, "Inhibition of human interleukin-13-induced respiratory and oesophageal inflammation by anti-human-interleukin-13 antibody (CAT-354)", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, LONDON, GB, (200508), vol. 35, no. 8, ISSN 0954-7894, pages 1096 - 1103, XP002393728 [A] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2222.2005.02299.x | [A] - YANG G ET AL, "Anti-IL-13 monoclonal antibody inhibits airway hyperresponsiveness, inflammation and airway remodeling", CYTOKINE, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20041221), vol. 28, no. 6, ISSN 1043-4666, pages 224 - 232, XP004654755 [A] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cyto.2004.08.007 |