Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
20.03.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.12.2014 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.12.2014 | First examination report | |
18.07.2014 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
02.07.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.06.2013 | Change - designated states | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
01.01.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
30.11.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |