Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8678852 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2014 | B2 | US2013005175 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1155780 | 28.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2541684 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1155780 | 28.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102012015956 | 24.09.2020 | B1 | BR102012015956 | 09.07.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR1155780 | 28.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2977384 | 02.08.2013 | B1 | FR2977384 | 04.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1155780 | 28.06.2011 |