EP2541684 - Connector for mutually connecting two electrical cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Societe Industrielle de Construction d'Appareils et de Materiel Electriques 19230 Arnac Pompadour / FR | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rineau, Vivien Tournevite 19210 Lubersac / FR | 02 /
Lagarde, Jean-Luc 2 Impasse Wilde 19360 Malemort / FR | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/01] | Lepelletier-Beaufond, François Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12173702.7 | 26.06.2012 | [2013/01] | Priority number, date | FR20110055780 | 28.06.2011 Original published format: FR 1155780 | [2013/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2541684 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24, H01R4/44, H01R13/514, // H01R4/06, H01R11/07 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H01R4/2408 (EP,US);
H01R13/514 (EP,US);
H01R4/44 (EP,US);
H01R11/07 (EP,US);
H01R4/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anschluss zum Verbinden von zwei Stromkabeln | [2013/01] | English: | Connector for mutually connecting two electrical cables | [2013/01] | French: | Connecteur pour relier l'un à l'autre deux câbles électriques | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 02.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/31] | 22.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4074608 (SIEBOL GEORGE) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 33 - line 49; figures 1,3,4,5 *; | [Y]US4904133 (WRIGHT JEWEL L [US]) [Y] 1,8-10* column 6, line 37 - line 49 *; | [Y]EP0497455 (AVDEL SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 5 * page 6, line 20 - line 45; figures 1,3a-3d *; | [Y]EP0586283 (GAZ DE FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * figures 1-3 *; | [YD]FR2760570 (APP MAT ELECT CONST [FR]) [YD] 1-10 * page 4 - page 6; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2819943 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [Y] 2 * page 12, line 6 - line 9; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2005164565 (FRICCHIONE MARK [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0041]; figures 4,6,7 *; | [Y]US2008170926 (TAYLOR HARRY E [US]) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039]; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | FR2760570 | FR2762449 |