13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
20.10.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
09.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
11.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
07.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.06.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
24.07.2013 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
19.07.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.07.2013 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
19.07.2013 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
07.05.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.04.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
09.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
04.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|