EP2506288 - Mass spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micromass Holdings Limited Stamford Avenue Altrincham Road Wilmslow SK9 4AX / GB | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Micromass Holdings Limited Floats Road Wythenshawe Manchester M23 9LZ / GB | ||
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Micromass UK Limited Floats Road Wythenshawe Manchester M23 9LZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, Martin Raymond 26 Grange Road Bowdon, Cheshire WA14 3EE / GB | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/40] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12173762.1 | 21.12.2006 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | GB20050026043 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0526043 | US20060758117P | 11.01.2006 Original published format: US 758117 P | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2506288 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2506288 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/42 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
H01J49/4235 (EP,US);
H01J49/427 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2012/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Massenspektrometer | [2012/40] | English: | Mass spectrometer | [2012/40] | French: | Spectromètre de masse | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06820639.0 / EP1964155 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060820639) is 09.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2006 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | IE | 21.12.2016 | LU | 21.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.12.2006 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]US5783824 (BABA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [XD] 1,16 * the whole document * [I] 2-15,17,18; | [A]US2005127290 (HASHIMOTO YUICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] - [0056] *; | [AP]WO2006075182 (MICROMASS LTD [GB], et al) [AP] 1-16 * abstract * * page 4 * * page 15 *; | [E]WO2007060436 (MICROMASS LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-16 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [XP] - HASHIMOTO ET AL, "Mass Selective Ejection by Axial Resonant Excitation from a Linear Ion Trap", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, US, (200605), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 685 - 690, XP005412910 [XP] 1-16 * pages 685-686; figure 1 * * page 686, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jasms.2006.01.011 | [A] - COLLINGS B A ET AL, "Observation of higher order quadrupole excitation frequencies in a linear ion trap", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (200011), vol. 11, no. 11, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 1016 - 1022, XP004224837 [A] 1-16 * page 1016 - page 1018; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1044-0305(00)00171-9 | [A] - WELLING M ET AL, "Ion/molecule reactions, mass spectrometry and optical spectroscopy in a linear ion trap", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1998), vol. 172, no. 1-2, ISSN 1387-3806, pages 95 - 114, XP004109270 [A] 1-16 * pages 98-102; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1176(97)00251-6 | by applicant | US5783824 |